EP2033078 - BROWSING RESPONSIVE TO SPEED OF GESTURES ON CONTACT SENSITIVE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UIQ Technology AB Soft Center 372 25 Ronneby / SE | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJÖLIN, Fredrik Högmarksvägen 8 372 34 Ronneby / SE | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07726153.5 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007EP05636 | Priority number, date | GB20060012624 | 26.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0612624 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000435 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033078 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BROWSEN ALS REAKTION AUF DIE GESCHWINDIGKEIT VON GESTEN AUF EINEM KONTAKTEMPFINDLICHEN DISPLAY | [2009/11] | English: | BROWSING RESPONSIVE TO SPEED OF GESTURES ON CONTACT SENSITIVE DISPLAY | [2009/11] | French: | NAVIGATION RÉAGISSANT À LA VITESSE DES GESTES SUR UN AFFICHEUR SENSIBLE AU CONTACT | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 02.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/02] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 2524 dated 07/06/2022) | UIQ Technology AB Soft Center 372 25 Ronneby / SE | [2022/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2021 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2022 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.12.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/25] | 01.06.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/47] | 30.12.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2020/47] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1130504 (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] - [0039]; figures 3-15 *; | [X]US5463725 (HENCKEL JONATHAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 13-24 * * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 23; figures 2,3 * * column 4, line 65 - column 7, line 9; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2006026521 (HOTELLING STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0054] - [0068] - [0076] , [0117] , [0118]; figures 1,20,21 *; | [Y]EP1241581 (DE SELYS LONGCHAMPS PATRICK [BE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0019] - [0033] - [0037] - [0045]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US6229502 (SCHWAB BRUCE W [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, lines 38-62 * * column 3, lines 12-29; figure 3 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 44; figure 6 * * column 5, lines 7-37 * |