EP1984600 - ADJUSTABLE SEGMENT EXPELLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eckgold, Roland Wiesenweg 1 42553 Velbert / DE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Willems, Volker Patentanwälte Weisse, Moltmann & Willems PartGmbB Am Lomberg 13 42555 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Willems, Volker Weisse, Moltmann & Willems Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Böckenbuschstr. 41 42555 Velbert / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Weisse, Renate Patentanwälte Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38 D-10623 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07726401.8 | 16.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007EP51512 | Priority number, date | DE20061007519 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006007519 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093637 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984600 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/22, F01C1/344, F01C21/08, F04C11/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
F01C1/22 (EP);
F01C1/3442 (EP);
F01C1/3445 (EP);
F01C21/0845 (EP);
F04C11/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARER SEGMENTVERDRÄNGER | [2008/44] | English: | ADJUSTABLE SEGMENT EXPELLER | [2008/44] | French: | POUSSOIR SEGMENTE AJUSTABLE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3642388 (MAISTRELLI ROGER) [X] 1-3,7-10,12-15 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 35 - line 76 * [Y] 4-6; | [X]GB1468285 (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP) [X] 1-3,7-10,12-15 * figures 1-11 * * page 3, line 21 - line 43 *; | [X]CH661096 (RYFFEL HANS) [X] 1-3,7-15 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 22 *; | [Y]US2006024179 (SCHMIDT MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 1-4,7,10,12-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0017] *; | [Y]US3066608 (LIVERMORE WILLIAM T) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 16 - line 18 * * column 4, line 16 - line 28 *; | [Y]FR2598746 (BITAR JOSEPH [SY]) [Y] 1-4,8-15 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 1 - line 6 *; | [DY]DE19840791 (JAEKER KARL PETER [DE], et al) [DY] 1-15 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 16 - line 50 * | Examination | EP0398377 | by applicant | DE102004035743 | EP0398377 | DE2425091 | DE19840791 | US3642388 | GB1468285 | CH661096 |