EP2010415 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACTUATING PASSENGER PROTECTION SYSTEMS CONSIDERING THE ROAD GRIP COEFFICIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Michael Bahnhofsplatz 2 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
GOLOMBECK, Marc-Andre Schwabstrasse 81 72074 Tuebingen / DE | 03 /
DOERR, Alfons Orplidstr. 8 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
DENZ, Holger Jakobstrasse 22 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/15] | Application number, filing date | 07726441.4 | 20.02.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP51620 | Priority number, date | DE20061018029 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018029 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007118725 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010415 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010415 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/0132 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0018 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01304 (EP,US);
B60W2552/40 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | B60R16/02, B60R21/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/22] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG VON PERSONENSCHUTZMITTELN UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG DES HAFTUNGSKOEFFIZIENTEN | [2009/02] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACTUATING PASSENGER PROTECTION SYSTEMS CONSIDERING THE ROAD GRIP COEFFICIENT | [2009/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIVATION DE MOYENS DE PROTECTION DES PERSONNES EN TENANT COMPTE DU COEFFFICIENT DE TENUE DE ROUTE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 20.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10303148 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0010] - [0013] * * claim 5 *; | [PX]WO2006081902 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * |