EP1989346 - HEDDLE FOR A WEAVING MACHINE, WEAVING MACHINE PROVIDED WITH ONE OR MORE OF SUCH HEDDLES AND METHOD FOR TO MANUFACTURE SUCH A HEDDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Darvan Invest N.V. Wezestraat 8A 8850 Ardooie / BE | [2018/14] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Darvan Invest N.V. Wezestraat 8A 8850 Ardooie / BE | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Michel Van de Wiele NV Michel Vandewielestraat 7 8510 Marke / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENEIRE, Michel Watervalstraat 39 B-8850 Ardooie / BE | [2019/25] |
Former [2018/08] | 01 /
DENEIRE, Michel Watervalstraat 39 B-8850 Ardooie / BE | ||
02 /
VANDERJEUGT, Bram Pannenhuisstraat 45 B-8900 Ieper / BE | |||
Former [2008/46] | 01 /
VANDERJEUGT, Bram Pannenhuisstraat 45 B-8900 Ieper / BE | Representative(s) | Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa DenK iP bvba Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [2018/14] |
Former [2008/46] | Ostyn, Frans K.O.B. NV President Kennedypark 31 C 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 07726508.0 | 26.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007EP51808 | Priority number, date | BE20060000123 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: BE 200600123 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096430 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989346 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1989346 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D03C9/02 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
D03C9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/14] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITZE FÜR EINE WEBMASCHINE, WEBMASCHINE MIT EINER ODER MEHREREN DERARTIGEN LITZEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DERARTIGEN LITZE | [2008/46] | English: | HEDDLE FOR A WEAVING MACHINE, WEAVING MACHINE PROVIDED WITH ONE OR MORE OF SUCH HEDDLES AND METHOD FOR TO MANUFACTURE SUCH A HEDDLE | [2008/46] | French: | LISSE POUR UN METIER A TISSER, METIER A TISSER MUNI DE TELLES LISSES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE LISSE | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 14.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2007 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1405940 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [DA] 1-21 * paragraphs [0039] - [0044]; figure 4 *; | [DA]US2019822 (JACOB KAUFMANN JOHN) [DA] 1-21 * figures 1-12 * |