EP2010599 - ELASTOMERIC PRODUCT WITH RADICALLY VULCANIZED RUBBER MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEVES, Reinhard Kurze Wende 4 30926 Seelze / DE | 02 /
WELL, Michael Flachsrottenweg 4A 38159 Vechelde / DE | 03 /
GRÜSSEL, Karl-Friedrich Schackstr. 7 29221 Celle / DE | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 D-30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07726562.7 | 01.03.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP51926 | Priority number, date | DE20061018717 | 20.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018717 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122031 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010599 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010599 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
C08K5/09 (EP,KR,US);
C08L9/00 (KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/24 (KR);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/26, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/098, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/09, C08L15/005 (US,EP);
C08K5/09, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/09, C08L23/16 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELASTOMERPRODUKT MIT RADIKALISCH VERNETZTER KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG | [2009/02] | English: | ELASTOMERIC PRODUCT WITH RADICALLY VULCANIZED RUBBER MIXTURE | [2009/02] | French: | PRODUIT ÉLASTOMÈRE AVEC MÉLANGE DE CAOUTCHOUC A RÉTICULATION RADICALAIRE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IE | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | LV | 22.07.2009 | MT | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | LU | 01.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
MT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
LU | 01.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
MT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
MT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/28] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
MT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
MT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IT | 01.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4309893 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US2005090618 (OKUNO SHIGEKI [JP]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |