EP1996543 - METHOD OF PRODUCING BENZOPHENONEIMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Thilo Goethestr. 5 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | 02 /
HAESE, Frank Theodor-Heuss-Ring 9 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | 03 /
KÖHLER, Ulrich Mudauer Ring 217 68259 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
SCHWAB, Ekkehard Berwartsteinstr.4 67434 Neustadt / DE | 05 /
MELDER, Johann-Peter Fichtenstr. 2 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | 06 /
EBERHARDT, Jan Cannabichstr. 8 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2008/49] | Application number, filing date | 07726567.6 | 01.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007EP51931 | Priority number, date | EP20060110980 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06110980 | [2008/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104650 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996543 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996543 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C249/02, A61Q17/04, A61K8/40, A61K8/41 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C07C249/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C249/02, C07C251/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BENZOPHENONIMINEN | [2008/49] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING BENZOPHENONEIMINES | [2008/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BENZOPHENONE IMINES | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2007 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | LV | 20.07.2011 | MT | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | AT | 01.03.2012 | LU | 01.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
AT | 01.03.2012 | ||
LU | 01.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
AT | 01.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
AT | 01.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 20.07.2011 | |
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0688764 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * example 1 ** page 3, line 1 - line 3 *; | [DYX]EP0713861 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-7 * abstract * * examples 1-4 * * page 3, line 14 - line 15 * [X] 8 |