EP2007725 - NON-PEPTIDIC RENIN INHIBITORS NITRODERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicox S.A. Taissounières HB4 1681 route des Dolines BP 313 06560 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMIRANTE, Nicoletta Via Caracciolo, 26 I-20155 Milano / IT | 02 /
BIONDI, Stefano Via Foscolo, 35 I-37057 San Giovanna Lupatolo / IT | 03 /
ONGINI, Ennio Via Fratelli Cervi, Residenza Campo I-20090 Segrate / IT | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Barchielli, Giovanna Nicox Research Institute S.r.l. Patent Department Via Ariosto, 21 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Barchielli, Giovanna Nicox Research Institute S.r.l., Patent Department, Via Ariosto, 21 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 07726569.2 | 01.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007EP51933 | Priority number, date | US20060782551P | 16.03.2006 Original published format: US 782551 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007104652 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2007725 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/78, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D451/02, C07D451/14, C07D487/08, C07D498/08, C07D513/08, A61K31/439, A61P9/12 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P5/42 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/78 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTPEPTIDISCHE NITRODERIVATE ALS RENININHIBITOREN | [2009/01] | English: | NON-PEPTIDIC RENIN INHIBITORS NITRODERIVATIVES | [2009/01] | French: | DÉRIVÉS NITRO D'INHIBITEURS DE RÉNINE NON PEPTIDIQUES | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9727749 (NITROMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * pages 7-9,20 * * pages 23,34,38; claim 1 *; | [IDY]WO2004096803 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [ID] 1 * page 9; claim 1 * [Y] 1-14; | [DI]WO2004096799 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [DI] 1 * page 8; claim 1 *; | [ID]WO2004096366 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [ID] 1 * page 8; claim 1 *; | [ID]WO2004096769 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [ID] 1 * pages 8-9; claim 1 *; | [ID]WO2004096804 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [ID] 1 * page 9; claim 1 *; | [I]WO2004096116 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [I] 1 * page 9; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2005054244 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [Y] 1-14* claim 1 * |