EP2005440 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MEMORY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBEHENSCHEL, Jens Sulzbacher Strasse 105 65835 Liederbach / DE | 02 /
BOETTCHER, Joern Bahnhofstr. 51 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2008/52] | Application number, filing date | 07726878.7 | 14.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP52382 | Priority number, date | DE20061013763 | 24.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013763 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110327 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005440 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C16/16, G06F11/10 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
G11C7/22 (KR);
G11C29/88 (EP,US);
G11C8/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/17] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SPEICHEREINRICHTUNG | [2008/52] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MEMORY UNIT | [2008/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 25.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2013 | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/51] | 05.08.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 13.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5475693 (CHRISTOPHERSON MARK [US], et al) [Y] 6-10,14,15 * column 11, line 33 - column 12, line 33; figure 5 *; | [Y]US5890188 (OKAMOTO YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,12,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - line 56; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6275960 (CAPPELLETTI PAOLO [IT], et al) [Y] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US6339546 (KATAYAMA KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003076604 (NEC ACCESS TECHNICA LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XY]US2004202024 (SHINAGAWA CHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10,14,15 |