EP1999084 - GYPSUM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Gips KG Am Bahnhof 7 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMMEL, Hans-Ulrich Am Hündlein 54 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727407.4 | 27.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007EP52934 | Priority number, date | EP20060111740 | 27.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06111740 | EP20060114519 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06114519 | [2008/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110428 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1999084 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/14 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B2111/0062 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B12/04, C04B22/0013, C04B2103/0025 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B12/04, C04B22/0013, C04B22/142, C04B24/38, C04B24/383, C04B38/10, C04B2103/12, C04B2103/22, C04B2103/30, C04B2103/40, C04B2103/46, C04B2103/65 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | 17.09.2008 | BA | 17.09.2008 | HR | 17.09.2008 | MK | 17.09.2008 | RS | 17.09.2008 | Title | German: | GIPSPRODUKT | [2008/50] | English: | GYPSUM PRODUCT | [2008/50] | French: | PRODUIT DE PLÂTRE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005072948 (UNITES STATES GYPSUM COMPANY) [X] 1,7-9,12-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0685438 (WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH) [X] 1-6,12-18 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4227920 (SUEDTHUERINGER ENTWICKLUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH ARBEIT UND UMWELT, O-6012) [X] 1-3,10,13-15,18 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH10330174 ; | [X]EP1029834 (RIGIPS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10-15,18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0258064 (WINROC HOLDINGS LTD [CA]) [X] 1-3,10,12-18 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1095412 (VAN GENECHTEN, F.) [X] 1-3,10,13,15,18 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10330174 A 19981215 (YOSHINO SEKKO KK) [X] 1,7-9,13,14,18 * abstract * | [X] - MOCHIZUKI, A., "Low-density gypsum boards", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19781225), vol. 89, no. 26, ISSN 0009-2258, page 280, XP000156386 [X] 1,2,6,13-15,18 * abstract * | Examination | GB1015331 |