EP2010355 - APPARATUS FOR LASER ANNEALING OF LARGE SUBSTRATES AND METHOD FOR LASER ANNEALING OF LARGE SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Laser Optics GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGER, Rafael Stolzingstrasse 6 81927 München / DE | 02 /
MARCZUK, Piotr Reiherstrasse 15 AALEN 73434 / DE | 03 /
SEIFERT, Wolfgang Heidestrasse 46 AALEN 73431 / DE | 04 /
TRITSCHLER, Thorsten Franz-Liszt-Strasse 7 73430 Aalen / DE | 05 /
ZENZINGER, Markus Promenade 25 89073 Ulm / DE | 06 /
ANDERL, Willi Posener Strasse 7 HÜTTLINGEN 73460 / DE | 07 /
WALTHER, Jörg August-Lämmle-Strasse 9 89547 Gerstetten / DE | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl Zeiss AG c/o Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 D-73447 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727502.2 | 29.03.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP53030 | Priority number, date | US20060745333P | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 745333 P | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122061 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010355 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06, B23K26/08, G02B27/09, B23K26/073, H01L21/20 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G02B27/09 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0604 (EP,KR);
B23K26/0648 (EP,KR);
B23K26/0652 (EP,KR);
B23K26/066 (EP,KR);
B23K26/0738 (EP,KR);
B23K26/0823 (EP,KR);
B23K26/083 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02422 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02532 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02678 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02686 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/22] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM LASERAUSGLÜHEN GROSSER SUBSTRATE UND VERFAHREN ZUM LASERAUSGLÜHEN GROSSER SUBSTRATE | [2009/02] | English: | APPARATUS FOR LASER ANNEALING OF LARGE SUBSTRATES AND METHOD FOR LASER ANNEALING OF LARGE SUBSTRATES | [2009/02] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECUIT AU LASER DE GRANDS SUBSTRATS | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 22.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH10209069 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] * [Y] 2,3,8-10; | [X]US6335509 (JUNG YUN HO [KR]) [X] 11,17,18,22 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 32 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 3,6 *; | [X]US2003089691 (TANAKA KOICHIRO [JP]) [X] 11,17,18,22 * figures 1a,1b,2 ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] *; | [X]US2003112322 (TANAKA KOICHIRO [JP]) [X] 11-22 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6717105 (OKAMOTO TATSUKI [JP], et al) [X] 11,17,18,22 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 35 * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 12 * * figures 1,5 *; | [XY]US2004084427 (TALWAR SOMIT [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * figures 1a-1c,12 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0044] - [0049] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125] * [Y] 2,3,8-10; | [A]US2005170572 (HONGO MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *; | [Y]US2005247684 (TANAKA KOICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 2,3,8-10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,2 * |