EP2010182 - USE OF C-SRC INHIBITORS DASATUNIB OR BOSUTINIB IN COMBINATION WITH NILOTINIB FOR THE TREATMENT OF LEUKEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/02] | USE OF C-SRC INHIBITORS IN COMBINATION WITH A PYRIMIDYLAMINOBENZAMIDE COMPOUND FOR THE TREATMENT OF LEUKEMIA | ||
[2014/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states NOVARTIS AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANLEY, Paul, W. Bruggweg 12 CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Krauss, Jan, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Roth, Peter Richard, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07727867.9 | 05.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP53399 | Priority number, date | US20060790437P | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 790437 P | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007116025 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2010182 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K31/4709, A61K31/519, A61P35/02 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON C-SRC-HEMMERN DASATUNIB ODER BOSUTINIB IN KOMBINATION MIT NILOTINIB ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LEUKÄMIE | [2014/17] | English: | USE OF C-SRC INHIBITORS DASATUNIB OR BOSUTINIB IN COMBINATION WITH NILOTINIB FOR THE TREATMENT OF LEUKEMIA | [2014/17] | French: | UTILISATION DES INHIBITEURS DE C-SRC DASATUNIB OU BOSUTINIB EN COMBINAISON AVEC LE NILOTINIB POUR TRAITER LA LEUCÉMIE | [2014/17] |
Former [2009/02] | VERWENDUNG VON C-SRC-HEMMERN IN KOMBINATION MIT EINER PYRIMIDYLAMINOBENZAMID-VERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LEUKÄMIE | ||
Former [2009/02] | USE OF C-SRC INHIBITORS IN COMBINATION WITH A PYRIMIDYLAMINOBENZAMIDE COMPOUND FOR THE TREATMENT OF LEUKEMIA | ||
Former [2009/02] | UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE C-SRC EN COMBINAISON AVEC UN COMPOSÉ PYRIMIDYLAMINOBENZAMIDE POUR TRAITER LA LEUCÉMIE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9728161 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1-13 * page 7, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * claims 9,11 *; | [Y]WO03013540 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, line 1 - page 5 * * claims 1-19 *; | [Y]EP1473043 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]) [Y] 1,3-6,8-12 * page 3, paragraphs 14,20 * * claims 1,3,8 *; | [X] - O'HARE T ET AL, "In vitro Activity of Bcr-Abl Inhibitors AMN107 and BMS-354825 against Clinically Relevant Imatinib -Resistant Abl Kinase Domain Mutants", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20050601), vol. 65, no. 11, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4500 - 4505, XP002414413 [X] 1,3-6,8-13 * page 4505, paragraph 5 - page 4505, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-0259 | [Y] - SHEILA A. DOGGRELL, "Is AMN-107 a step forward from Imatinib in the treatment of chronic myeloid leukaemia?", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2005), vol. 7, pages 1063 - 1066, XP002452410 [Y] 1,3-6,8-13 * page 1065, column 2, paragraphs 2,3 * | [Y] - MANLEY ET AL, "Advances in the structural biology, design and clinical development of Bcr-Abl kinase inhibitors for the treatment of chronic myeloid leukaemia", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - PROTEINS & PROTEOMICS, ELSEVIER, (20051230), vol. 1754, no. 1-2, ISSN 1570-9639, pages 3 - 13, XP005214189 [Y] 1,3-6,8-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbapap.2005.07.040 | [PX] - BRADEEN HEATHER A ET AL, "COMPARISON OF IMATINIB, MESYLATE, DASATINIB (BMS-354825), AND NILOTINIB (AMN107) IN AN N-ETHYL-N-NITROSOUREA (ENU)-BASED MUTAGENESIS SCREEN: HIGH EFFICACY OF DRUG COMBINATIONS", BLOOD, W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20061001), vol. 108, no. 7, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2332 - 2338, XP009082064 [PX] 1,3-6,8-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-02-004580 | Examination | WO2005047259 |