EP2011169 - PIEZO ACTUATOR COMPRISING EXTERNALLY CONTACTED INNER ELECTRODES OF A PIEZO ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOHMANN, Eugen Schaumbergstrasse 9 96191 Viereth-Trunstadt / DE | 02 /
FERGEN, Immanuel Rossmarkt 15 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/11] | Application number, filing date | 07728184.8 | 17.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP53719 | Priority number, date | DE20061018056 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018056 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007118879 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011169 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2011169 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/047 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
H10N30/872 (EP,US);
H10N30/063 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/22] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PIEZOAKTOR MIT AUSSEN KONTAKTIERTEN INNENELEKTRODEN EINES PIEZOELEMENTS | [2009/02] | English: | PIEZO ACTUATOR COMPRISING EXTERNALLY CONTACTED INNER ELECTRODES OF A PIEZO ELEMENT | [2009/02] | French: | PIÉZOACTIONNEUR DOTÉ D'ÉLECTRODES INTERNES, À CONTACT EXTERNE, D'UN ÉLÉMENT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 20.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.03.2012 | FR | 14.05.2012 | GB | 14.06.2012 | ES | 25.06.2012 | [2013/22] |
Former [2013/21] | IT | 14.03.2012 | |
FR | 14.05.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | IT | 14.03.2012 | |
FR | 14.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | IT | 14.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0844678 (CERAMTEC AG [DE]); | [A]DE10208417 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO03105246 (PI CERAMIC GMBH KERAMISCHE TEC [DE], et al); | [XY]DE10236986 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | by applicant | WO03105246 | DE10236986 |