EP2146629 - AN EMG CONTROLLED VENTILATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/04] | AN EMG CONTROLLED VENTILATOR AND A METHOD FOR AN EMG CONTROLLED VENTILATOR | ||
[2019/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maquet Critical Care AB PO Box 6108 171 06 Solna / SE | [2019/52] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Maquet Critical Care AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGERBORG, Johan Sommarstigen 21 S-144 42 Rönninge / SE | 02 /
LAKSOV, Joakim Örtvägen 3 S-182 56 Danderyd / SE | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Börlin, Maria, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07728611.0 | 27.04.2007 | [2010/04] | WO2007EP54156 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008131798 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146629 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146629 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0488, A61M16/00 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
A61M16/0051 (EP,US);
A61M16/0096 (US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M2210/1014 (EP,US);
A61M2230/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2010/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EMG-GESTEUERTES BEATMUNGSGERÄT | [2019/35] | English: | AN EMG CONTROLLED VENTILATOR | [2019/35] | French: | VENTILATEUR COMMANDÉ PAR EMG | [2019/35] |
Former [2010/04] | EMG-GESTEUERTES BEATMUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN EMG-GESTEUERTES BEATMUNGSGERÄT | ||
Former [2010/04] | AN EMG CONTROLLED VENTILATOR AND A METHOD FOR AN EMG CONTROLLED VENTILATOR | ||
Former [2010/04] | VENTILATEUR COMMANDÉ PAR EMG ET MÉTHODE ASSOCIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2007 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | GB | 27.04.2020 | IE | 27.04.2020 | LU | 27.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
GB | 27.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
GB | 27.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0324275 (VISVESHWARA M D INC N [US]) [A] 1,8,15,19 * column 10, line 27 - column 11, line 18; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0774269 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [A] 6,13,15,19 * column 5, line 17 - line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6411843 (ZARYCHTA JAROSLAW [CA]) [A] 1,8,15,19 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 54; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2003000526 (GOBEL FRED [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6-9,13-15,19 * paragraph [0086]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2003100843 (HOFFMAN ANDREW [US]) [A] 1,8,15,19 * paragraphs [0003] , [0108] , [0125] *; | [DY]US6588423 (SINDERBY CHRISTER [CA]) [DY] 1,2,6-9,13-15,19 * column 6, line 3 - line 41 * * column 11, line 39 - line 46 * * column 12, line 42 - line 60; figures 1-11 *; | [A]WO2004078246 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,8,15,19* figures 1-4; claim 18 * | Examination | WO2006131149 | by applicant | US6588423 |