EP2082545 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND DEVICES FOR ESTABLISHING A REGISTRATIONLESS DATA COMMUNICATION CONNECTION BETWEEN ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENGTSSON, Henrik Postiljonsgatan 9 227 36 Lund / SE | 02 /
SANGBERG, Troed Almbacksgatan 16 21154 Malmö / SE | [2009/35] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
BENGTSSON, Henrik Qvantenborgsvägen 33 22738 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
SANGBERG, Troed Almbacksgatan 16 21154 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | VALEA AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07728812.4 | 04.05.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007EP54359 | Priority number, date | US20060862937P | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 862937 P | US20060564617 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: US 564617 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008049647 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082545 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082545 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/64, H04M1/253 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/20 (EP);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04M1/72436 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND EINRICHTUNGEN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER REGISTRATIONSLOSEN DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄTEN | [2009/31] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND DEVICES FOR ESTABLISHING A REGISTRATIONLESS DATA COMMUNICATION CONNECTION BETWEEN ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2009/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET DISPOSITIFS POUR ÉTABLIR UNE CONNEXION DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES SANS ENREGISTREMENT ENTRE DES DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2007 | AT | 21.12.2011 | BE | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | IT | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | MT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | ES | 01.04.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | IE | 04.05.2012 | LU | 04.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
LU | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9901999 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-57 * figures 1-6 * * page 6, line 16 - page 9, line 18 *; | [A]GB2342807 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-57* page 9, line 14 - page 17, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0051375 (GENESYS TELECOMM LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-57 * figures 2,3 * * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 30 *; | [X]EP1616432 (AXESSTEL INC [US]) [X] 1-57 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 26 * |