EP2024412 - AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF AN AUTO-OXIDATIVELY DRYING POLYURETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuplex Resins B.V. Synthesebaan 1 4612 RB Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESTACH, Dirk Emiel Paula Elsendonkstraat 79 2560 Nijlen / BE | 02 /
BAKX, Fredericus Cornelis Adrianus Antwerpsestraatweg 231 4624 JG Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Derks, Wilbert, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Derks, Wilbert, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07729035.1 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007EP54583 | Priority number, date | EP20060113887 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06113887 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131959 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024412 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024412 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/65, C08G18/36, C08G18/08, C08G18/69 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/36 (EP,US);
C08G18/6541 (EP,US);
C08G18/6547 (EP,US);
C08G18/6576 (EP,US);
C08G18/69 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE DISPERSION EINES AUTOOXIDATIV TROCKNENDEN POLYURETHANS | [2009/08] | English: | AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF AN AUTO-OXIDATIVELY DRYING POLYURETHANE | [2009/08] | French: | DISPERSION AQUEUSE D'UN POLYURÉTHANE SÉCHANT PAR AUTOXYDATION | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 18.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | MT | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4644030 (LOEWRIGKEIT PETER [US], et al) [DX] 1-23 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * example XII * * column 15, line 23 *; | [DA]EP0640632 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DA] 1-23 * page 1, line 1 * * example 1 *; | [DX]US2004260008 (BECHARA IBRAHIM [US], et al) [DX] 1-23 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0042] * * example 5 *; | [DA]WO2006047746 (NOVEON IP HOLDINGS CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-23 * paragraph [0001] ** example 9 * |