EP2021017 - VACCINATION AGAINST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/07] | METHOD | ||
[2009/15] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart Brussels / BE | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRICHARD, Vincent GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals sa rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 02 /
LEHMANN, Frederic Francois Eugene GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals sa rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Lovatt, Victoria Jayne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Lovatt, Victoria Jayne, et al GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property CN925.1, 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07729468.4 | 24.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007EP55037 | Priority number, date | GB20060010547 | 26.05.2006 Original published format: GB 0610547 | GB20070007307 | 16.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0707307 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007137986 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2021017 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/47 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K39/001186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 14.11.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFUNG GEGEN KREPS | [2009/15] | English: | VACCINATION AGAINST CANCER | [2009/15] | French: | VACCIN CONTRE LE CANCER | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/07] | VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2009/07] | METHOD | ||
Former [2009/07] | MÉTHODE | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/05] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005105139 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al); |