EP2027554 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR SECURE ACCESS CONTROL TO A STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FACTOR, Michael 32 Rachel Street 34402 Haifa / IL | 02 /
NAOR, Dalit 4 Rosanes Street 69018 Tel-Aviv-Jaffa / IL | 03 /
RODEH, Michael 42 Shlonsky Street 34987 Haifa / IL | 04 /
SATRAN, Julian 126/1 Shoshanet HaYam Street 30300 Atlit / IL | 05 /
TAL, Sivan 5/2 Nachal Sorek Street 20692 Yokneam IIit / IL | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Waldner, Philip IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Waldner, Philip IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 07729791.9 | 01.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP55390 | Priority number, date | US20060422096 | 05.06.2006 Original published format: US 422096 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007141206 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027554 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/24 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
G06F21/62 (EP,US);
G06F21/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND RECHNERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR SICHEREN ZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNG ZU EINER SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2009/09] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR SECURE ACCESS CONTROL TO A STORAGE DEVICE | [2009/09] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS SÉCURISÉ À UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0022497 (AMECON CZECH S R O [CZ], et al) [Y] 1-35 * abstract *; | [A]WO02099640 (YAHOO INC [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] *; | [A]US6643774 (MCGARVEY JOHN RYAN [US]) [A] * column 7, lines 1-15 * * column 11, line 38 - column 12, line 16 *; | [A]US2004122958 (WARDROP PATRICK RYAN [US]) [A] * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] *; | [Y] - SCHNEIER B, "Applied Cryptography , PASSAGE", APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY. PROTOCOLS, ALGORITHMS, AND SOURCE CODE IN C, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, US, (1996), ISBN 0-471-11709-9, pages 566 - 571, XP002214000 [Y] 1-35 * page 566 - page 571 * |