EP2041729 - READER FOR A DOCUMENT, METHOD FOR READING A DATA OBJECT AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10958 Berlin / DE | [2010/35] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10958 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Kim Lychener Strasse 8 10437 Berlin / DE | 02 /
FREYTAG, Claus Galvanistrasse 8 10587 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FRÖHLICH, Martin Gartenstrasse 34 13088 Berlin / DE | 04 /
OSTERODE, Gunnar Markgraf-Albrecht-Strasse 8 10711 Berlin / DE | 05 /
CHRYSELIUS, Toralf Wilhelmstrasse 49 16562 Bergfelde / DE | 06 /
HILL, Jan Sebastianstr. 33 10179 Berlin / DE | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
NGUYEN, Kim Lychener Strasse 8 10437 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
FREYTAG, Claus Galvanistrasse 8 10587 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
FRÖHLICH, Martin Gartenstrasse 34 13088 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
OSTERODE, Gunnar Markgraf-Albrecht-Strasse 8 10711 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
CHRYSELIUS, Toralf Wilhelmstrasse 49 16562 Bergfelde / DE | |||
06 /
HILL, Jan Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 9 10179 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstrasse 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Richardt Patentanwälte Wilhelmstrasse 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/35] | Richardt, Markus Albert Richardt Patents Trademarks Wilhelmstrasse 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Richardt, Markus Albert Richardt Patents & Trademarks Leergasse 11 65343 Eltville am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07730025.9 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP55671 | Priority number, date | DE20061027253 | 09.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006027253 | [2009/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007141338 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2041729 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041729 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
G06Q20/327 (EP);
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G07F7/0866 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LESEGERÄT FÜR EIN DOKUMENT, VERFAHREN ZUM LESEN EINES DATENOBJEKTS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2009/14] | English: | READER FOR A DOCUMENT, METHOD FOR READING A DATA OBJECT AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2009/14] | French: | APPAREIL DE LECTURE POUR UN DOCUMENT, PROCÉDÉ POUR LA LECTURE D'UN OBJET DE DONNÉES ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 11.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.09.2010 | CZ | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | EE | 01.09.2010 | HU | 01.09.2010 | IE | 01.09.2010 | IT | 01.09.2010 | LT | 01.09.2010 | LV | 01.09.2010 | MT | 01.09.2010 | PL | 01.09.2010 | RO | 01.09.2010 | SI | 01.09.2010 | SK | 01.09.2010 | TR | 01.09.2010 | BG | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | IS | 01.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
TR | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9852136 (AMERICAN CARD TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 17 - line 21 * * page 7, line 3 - line 25 * * page 11, line 19 - page 14, line 4 *; | [X]US2002095587 (DOYLE RONALD P [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0034] *; | [X]DE102004056007 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [IP]EP1686541 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [IP] 1-21 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] * * claims 7,8,11,12,20 *; | [X] - BUNDESAMT FÜR SICHERHEIT IN DER INFORMATIONSTECHNIK, "Risiken und Chancen des Einsatzes von RFID-Systemen", Print Medium and Online, ISBN 3-922746-56-X, (200410), pages 1 - 128, URL: http://www.bsi.de/fachthem/rfid/RIKCHA.pdf, (20071205), XP002461316 [X] 1-21 * figures 5-3 * * page 42 * * page 46 - page 49 * |