EP2026666 - UNIT SERVING APPETITE SUPPRESSANT COMPOSITIONS WITH STEROIDAL GLYCOSIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
CSIR Scientia Meiring Naude Rd. Pretoria / ZA | [2015/15] |
Former [2009/09] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAHAMSE, Salomon, Leendert Unilever R & D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
POVEY, Kevin, John Unilever Bestfoods UK London Road Purfleet, Essex RM19 1SD / GB | 03 /
REES, Daryl, David Phytopharm PLC Corpus Christi House 9 West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE29 2HY / GB | [2015/24] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
ABRAHAMSE, Salomon, Leendert Unilever R & D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
02 /
POVEY, Kevin, John Unilever Bestfoods UK London Road Purfleet, Essex RM19 1SD / GB | |||
03 /
REES, Daryl, David Phytopharm PLC Corpus Christi House 9 West Street Godmanchester, Cambridgeshire PE29 2HY / GB | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/18] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 07730088.7 | 12.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP55764 | Priority number, date | EP20060115404 | 13.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06115404 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007144347 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026666 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026666 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A61K36/27 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A23L33/16 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A23L33/30 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEROIDAL-GLYCOSIDE ENTHALTENDE ESSBARE APPETITZÜGELNDE PRODUKTE | [2014/32] | English: | UNIT SERVING APPETITE SUPPRESSANT COMPOSITIONS WITH STEROIDAL GLYCOSIDES | [2009/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMESTIBLES SUPPRIMANT L'APPETIT CONTENANT DES GLYCOSIDES STEROÏDIQUES | [2014/32] |
Former [2009/09] | APPETITZÜGELNDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN IN SERVIEREINHEITFORM MIT STEROIDALEN GLYKOSIDEN | ||
Former [2009/09] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS COMESTIBLES CONTENANT DES GLYCOSIDES STEROÏDIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 31.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2007 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | PT | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | IE | 12.06.2015 | LU | 12.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 12.06.2007 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.06.2007 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1166792 (PHYTOPHARM PLC [GB]) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0028] , [0029] *; | [A]WO03041727 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 1, lines 19-21 * * page 3, line 7 * * page 5, lines 19-23 * * page 7, line 26 - page 10, line 9 *; | [A]US2005266137 (EPPLER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0032] , [0060] - [0063] - [0075] - [0079] - [0114] , [0115] , [0119] *; | [DA]US2005276839 (RIFKIN CALMAN H [US]) [DA] 1-27 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0009] , [0014] , [0015] , [0025] , [0036] , [0049] , [0051] , [0055] - [0057] *; | [DA]US7008648 (CORLEY DAVID GREGORY [US], et al) [DA] 1-27; | [DA]US2006083795 (SHATKINA LIMA [US], et al) [DA] 1-27 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] - [0018] - [0025] , [0026] *; | [A] - "Commision Directive 96/8/EC of 26 February 1996 on foods intended for use in energy-restricted diets for weigth reduction", INTERNET CITATION, (19960226), URL: http://europa.eu.int/comm/food/food/labellingnutrition/weight/df09_en.pd, (20041206), XP002310347 [A] 1-27 * Annex I * | Examination | US3966918 | - SCHONER W, "Endogenous cardiac glycosides, a new class of steroid hormones", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, BERLIN, DE, (20020101), vol. 269, doi:10.1046/J.1432-1033.2002.02911.X, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 2440 - 2448, XP002367830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1033.2002.02911.x |