EP1987927 - HANDLE CONNECTOR FOR HAND TOOL OR UTENSIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zubiaurre Alberdi, Pedro José Polígono Ibaitarte Pabellón A-7 20870 Elgoibar / ES | For all designated states Zubiaurre Alberdi, Manuel M Polígono Ibaitarte Pabellón A-7 20870 Elgoibar / ES | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel Consultores Urizar y Cia, S.L. Gordoniz 22 5[deg] 48012 Bilbao Vizcaya / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel Consultores Urizar Y Cia, S.L. Gordoniz, 22-5 P.O. Box 6454 48012 Bilbao (Vizcaya) / ES | Application number, filing date | 07730321.2 | 14.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007ES00080 | Priority number, date | ES20060000363 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: ES 200600363 | ES20060000861 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: ES 200600861 | [2008/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093655 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987927 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25G3/28, F16B39/30, B25G3/12 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
B25G3/28 (EP,KR,US);
B25G3/12 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T403/7009 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | B25G3/12, B25G3/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRIFFVERBINDER FÜR EIN HANDWERKZEUG ODER GERÄT | [2008/45] | English: | HANDLE CONNECTOR FOR HAND TOOL OR UTENSIL | [2008/45] | French: | FIXATION DU MANCHE D'UN USTENSILE OU D'UN OUTIL MANUEL | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | Translation filed | 16.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/20] | 30.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US191073 (ROBERTS) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH262359 (URBEN FRITZ [CH], et al) [Y] 2 * page 2, paragraph 3; figure 5 *; | [A]US3129737 (ARMAND CITROEN) [A] 1* column 2, lines 18-30; figure - *; | [Y]GB1023759 (MARIO MAINETTI) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 33; figure - *; | [Y]DE8527757U (RICHARD BERGNER GMBH & CO, 8540 SCHWABACH, DE) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5122146 (CHAPMAN MICHAEL W [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 2; figures 20,21 * | International search | [A]US2202863 (MAX PLON); | [Y]US3211198 (GLASGOW CLARENCE O); | [X]GB1023759 (MARIO MAINETTI); | [XP]CA2571388 (ZUBIAURRE ALBERDI PEDRO JOSE [ES], et al) |