EP2128874 - ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT INSULATED WITH A BIODEGRADABLE DIELECTRIC FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanchez De Lema, Alberto Avenida de la Salud 23 28411 Moralzarzal (Madrid) / ES | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07730390.7 | 16.03.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007ES00149 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113866 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128874 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128874 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/20, H01F27/12 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H01B3/22 (EP);
H01F27/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | MIT EINEM BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREN DIELEKTRISCHEN FLUID ISOLIERTE ELEKTRISCHE GERÄTE | [2009/49] | English: | ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT INSULATED WITH A BIODEGRADABLE DIELECTRIC FLUID | [2009/49] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE ISOLÉ AVEC UN FLUIDE DIÉLECTRIQUE BIODÉGRADABLE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2009 | Translation filed | 16.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2007 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | IT | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002027219 (OOMMEN THOTTATHIL V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 5; claims 1-44; tables 1-2 *; | [A]US2006030499 (OOMMEN THOTTATHIL V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0041]; examples 1-6; tables 1-2 *; | [A]US5928696 (BEST BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 10 * | International search | [X]US2006030499 (OOMMEN THOTTATHIL V [US], et al); | [A]WO0011682 (ABB POWER T & D CO [US]); | [A]EP1365420 (COOPER IND INC [US]) | by applicant | EP1365420 | US2004069975 | US6613250 | US6340658 | US6645404 | US6280659 | JP2000090740 | JP2005317259 | US5928696 |