EP2002705 - TAG FOR IDENTIFYING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | CROTAL FOR IDENTIFYING ANIMALS | ||
[2016/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allflex Europe, S.A.S. ZI. Plage Route des Eaux BP 90219 35502 Vitre Cedex / FR | [2014/10] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Cromasa Identificacion Electronica, S.A. Poligono Berriainz, 24 31013 Berriozar / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÓPEZ CISNEROS, Nicolas Pol. Berriainz, 24 E-31013 Berriozar Navarra / ES | 02 /
JUANIZ MORIONES, Idoia Pol. Berriainz, 24 E-31013 Berriozar Navarra / ES | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/51] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07730391.5 | 19.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007ES00150 | Priority number, date | ES20060000707 | 21.03.2006 Original published format: ES 200600707 | ES20070000526 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: ES 200700526 | [2008/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007107612 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002705 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2002705 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 27.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01F11/00, A01K11/00 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
A01K11/001 (EP);
A01K11/004 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | A01F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | MARKE ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON TIEREN | [2008/51] | English: | TAG FOR IDENTIFYING ANIMALS | [2016/44] | French: | BOUCLE AURICULAIRE DESTINÉE À L'IDENTIFICATION D'ANIMAUX | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/51] | CROTAL FOR IDENTIFYING ANIMALS | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2008 | Translation filed | 20.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 24.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003182831 (HAAR KARY [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0034] - [0041] * * figures 1-10 *; | [YD]ES2198085T (ALLFLEX NEW ZEALAND) [YD] 1-9 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 64 * * figures 1-10 *; | [AD]WO2004034779 (ALLFLEX EUROP S A S [FR]; COSTANTINI ANNE [FR]) [AD] 6-9 * the whole document * | International search | [X]ES1058014U (CROMASA IDENTIFICACION ELECTRO [ES]); | [X]EP0913083 (OS HUSDYRMERKEFABRIKK A S [NO]); | [X]ES2198085T (ALLFLEX NEW ZEALAND); | [A]ES2139657T (ALLFLEX NEW ZEALAND); | [A]US6098324 (NEPOTE ALAIN [FR]); | [A]FR2687823 (CROUZOULON PIERRE MARIE [FR]) | by applicant | WO9504455 | WO9110982 | ES1037475U | FR2635437 | FR2442583 | ES2198085T | GB2294664 | EP0105796 | AU56733 | ES2196477T | EP0138629 | US5308351 | US4581834 | ES287068U | ES288950 | EP1037525 | US4506630 | EP0219186 | WO9202127 | WO2004034779 |