EP1994221 - PREVENTION OF BACTERIAL SPORE FORMATION IN A BROKE SYSTEM OF A BOARD MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemira Oyj Porkkalankatu 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLARI, Marko Palttinatie 22 01260 Vantaa / FI | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2008/48] | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07730533.2 | 15.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007FI00064 | Priority number, date | FI20060000247 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: FI 20060247 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007125154 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994221 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994221 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/36 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
D21H21/36 (EP,FI,US);
A01N37/44 (FI);
A01N33/08 (FI);
A01N37/20 (FI);
A01N37/46 (FI);
A01N57/12 (FI);
A01N57/20 (FI);
D21H17/01 (FI);
D21H17/05 (FI);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERHINDERUNG DER BILDUNG VON BAKTERIELLEN SPOREN IM AUSSCHUSS-SYSTEM EINER PAPPMASCHINE | [2008/48] | English: | PREVENTION OF BACTERIAL SPORE FORMATION IN A BROKE SYSTEM OF A BOARD MACHINE | [2008/48] | French: | PREVENTION DE FORMATION DE SPORES BACTERIENNES DANS UN SYSTEME DE CASSES DE FABRICATION D'UNE MACHINE A CARTON | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 19.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2007 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | IE | 15.03.2013 | LU | 15.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GB | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/32] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GB | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GB | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | BE | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1268558 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-20,1-20,1-20 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]EP0799928 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20,1-20,1-20 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]WO0106877 (RHODIA [US]) [A] 1-20,1-20,1-20 * the whole document * * the whole document ** the whole document *; | [A]US6294186 (BEERSE PETER WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-20,1-20,1-20 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]WO02078450 (HERCULES INC [US]) [A] 1-20,1-20,1-20 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * |