EP2008254 - SECURITY DEVICE FOR MONITORING INTEGRITY OF CLOSED OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4TS Finland Oy Parantolankatu 11 05800 Hyvinkäa / FI | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAANANEN, Jyrki Parantolankatu 11 FI-05800 Hyvinkää / FI | 02 /
MARTINKALLIO, Tuomas Vehkaojantie 12 FI-05830 Hyvinkää / FI | 03 /
KIVIMÄKI, Timo Linnustajankuja 1 E 28 02940 Espoo / FI | [2009/18] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
PAANANEN, Jyrki Parantolankatu 11 FI-05800 Hyvinkää / FI | ||
02 /
MARTINKALLIO, Tuomas Vehkaojantie 12 FI-05830 Hyvinkää / FI | |||
03 /
KIVIMÄKI, Timo Kurkimäentie 3 B 10 FI-00940 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/01] | Konkonen, Tomi-Matti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07730541.5 | 23.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007FI00072 | Priority number, date | WO2006FI00098 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: PCT/FI2006/000098 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110467 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008254 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/08, G08B13/14, G08B13/16, G08B13/18, G08B25/10 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G08B13/14 (EP,US);
G08B13/1436 (EP,US);
G08B13/1481 (EP,US);
G08B13/149 (EP,US);
G08B25/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN DER INTEGRITÄT GESCHLOSSENER OBJEKTE | [2009/01] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE FOR MONITORING INTEGRITY OF CLOSED OBJECTS | [2009/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'INTEGRITE D'OBJETS CLOS | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 29.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2009 | 31.03.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2013 | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2014 | 31.03.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4337462 (LEMELSON JEROME H) [X] 1-9,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 1, line 44 * * column 1, line 60 - column 1, line 62 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, line 46 - column 4, line 63 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005093677 (BARBARIE YVES [FR], et al) [A] 13 * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3; figures 1-8 * | International search | [X]US2005222933 (WESBY PHILIP B [GB]); | [X]US2005068177 (CHUN SOON YONG [KR], et al); | [X]EP1522981 (TAMTRON OY [FI]); | [X]US2004100379 (BOMAN HANS [SE], et al); | [X]US2005040229 (ANDREWS KARL [AU], et al); | [X]WO2005076238 (VENDOLOCUS AB [SE], et al) |