EP2015880 - METHOD FOR COOLING ANODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/04] | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR COOLING ANODES | ||
[2013/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Puolikkotie 10 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUMPPIO, Juha Viherlaaksonranta 14 B 17 FI-02710 Espoo / FI | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/07] | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07730585.2 | 03.05.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007FI00116 | Priority number, date | FI20060000429 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: FI 20060429 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007128861 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015880 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2015880 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B22D25/04, B22D5/02 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
B22D25/04 (EP,FI,KR,US);
B22D30/00 (FI);
B22D5/02 (EP,FI,KR,US);
C25C1/12 (EP,US);
C25C7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN VON ANODEN | [2013/28] | English: | METHOD FOR COOLING ANODES | [2013/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'ANODES | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/04] | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN VON ANODEN | ||
Former [2009/04] | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR COOLING ANODES | ||
Former [2009/04] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'ANODES | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 25.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2007 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | IE | 03.05.2014 | LU | 03.05.2014 | GB | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
GB | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
GB | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
GB | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
GB | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU473863B (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [X] 1-3,5-17 * figure 1 * * pages 3-8 *; | [X]JP2003205354 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1-3,5-17 * abstract *; | [X]JPH09210797 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1-3,5-17 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5881550 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 10-17 * abstract *; | [A]US3976120 (RAAB STEFAN) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 19 - line 34 * | International search | [A]JPS62104665 (AKITA SEIREN KK, et al); | [A]JPH09164468 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JPH05237637 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO, et al); | [A]JPH04253562 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) | by applicant | AU6567874 | JP2003205354 | JPH09210797 | JPS5881550 |