EP2019776 - AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR REDUCING THE INDUCED DRAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOL, Thierry 18, rue René Teisseire F-31330 Grenade / FR | 02 /
DEFOS, Marjorie 37, rue Gabriel Péri F-31000 Toulouse / FR | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Petit, Maxime Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée BP 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | Petit, Maxime Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07731447.4 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007FR00806 | Priority number, date | FR20060004629 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604629 | [2009/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007135270 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2019776 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019776 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64C7/02, B64C1/14, B64C23/06, B64D29/02 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
B64C1/1453 (EP,US);
B64C23/06 (EP,US);
B64C7/02 (EP,US);
B64D29/02 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES LUFTWIDERSTANDS | [2009/06] | English: | AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR REDUCING THE INDUCED DRAG | [2009/06] | French: | AERONEF COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE REDUCTION DE LA TRAINEE INDUITE | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | IE | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | LV | 27.10.2010 | MT | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | LU | 11.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4019696 (HIRT WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 22 - line 25 * * column 5, line 19 - line 36 *; | [A]US4314681 (KUTNEY JOHN T) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 8,9 *; | [A]GB2112077 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 43 - line 48 * * page 3, line 67 - line 78 *; | [A]US4643376 (VANDERHOEVEN ANTONIUS J [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 4,6,7 *; | [A]US5443230 (LORD WESLEY K [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** figures 1,4 *; | [A]US6116015 (TAYLOR KATHRYN V [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005011993 (KONINGS CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2 * |