EP1999998 - METHOD FOR BINAURAL SYNTHESIS TAKING INTO ACCOUNT A SPATIAL EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/50] | METHOD FOR BINAURAL SYNTHESIS TAKING INTO ACCOUNT A THEATER EFFECT | ||
[2012/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAURE, Julien Perrin Ar Gac F-22300 Lannion / FR | 02 /
GUERIN, Alexandre 1ter rue Armand Barbès F-35000 Rennes / FR | 03 /
NICOL, Rozenn 2 place du Martray F-22450 La Roche Derrien / FR | 04 /
PALLONE, Grégory 10 résidence du Rhun F-22660 Trélévern / FR | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
FAURE, Julien Perrin Ar Gac F-22300 Lannion / FR | ||
02 /
GUERIN, Alexandre 1ter rue Armand Barbès F-35000 Rennes / FR | |||
03 /
NICOL, Rozenn 2 place du Martray F-22450 La Roche Derrien / FR | |||
04 /
PALLONE, Grégory 44 Résidence Corlay F-22300 Lannion / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/50] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07731711.3 | 08.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007FR50895 | Priority number, date | FR20060002694 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0602694 | [2008/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110520 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1999998 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1999998 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04S1/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
H04S1/005 (EP,US);
H04S2400/01 (EP,US);
H04S3/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BINAURALEN SYNTHESE UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG EINES RAUMEFFEKTS | [2012/07] | English: | METHOD FOR BINAURAL SYNTHESIS TAKING INTO ACCOUNT A SPATIAL EFFECT | [2012/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE BINAURALE PRENANT EN COMPTE UN EFFET DE SALLE | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/50] | VERFAHREN ZUR KUNSTKOPF-SYNTHESE UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG EINES THEATEREFFEKTS | ||
Former [2008/50] | METHOD FOR BINAURAL SYNTHESIS TAKING INTO ACCOUNT A THEATER EFFECT | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 27.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.02.2012 | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2007 | AT | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | IE | 08.03.2013 | LU | 08.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5438623 (BEGAULT DURAND R [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 5 - column 8, line 15 *; | [A]US5459790 (SCOFIELD WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 10 - line 46 * * column 14, line 38 - column 15, line 66 *; | [A]US6307941 (TANNER JR THEODORE CALHOUN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 17 * |