EP2005562 - GENERATOR AND MAGNETIC FLUX CONDUCTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Court Of The University of Edinburgh Old College South Bridge Edinburgh EH8 9YL / GB | [2016/51] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states NGenTec Limited. 5th Floor, 125 Princes Street Edinburgh EH42 4AD / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states The University Court of the University of Edinburgh 1-7 Roxburgh Edinburgh EH8 9TA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Markus 42 Swan Spring Avenue Edinburgh EH10 6NH / GB | 02 /
OCHIJE, Kenneth School of Engineering & Electronics University of Edinburgh The King's Buildings Edinburgh EH9 3JL / GB | [2018/27] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
MUELLER, Markus 42 Swan Spring Avenue Edinburgh EH10 6NH / GB | ||
02 /
OCHIJE, Kenneth School of Engineering & Electronics University of Edinburgh The King's Buildings Edinburgh EH9 3JL / GB | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/45] | McIlroy, Steven David, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | Peter, Kenneth William Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732025.7 | 14.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007GB00883 | Priority number, date | GB20060005298 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0605298 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104976 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005562 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005562 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/18, H02K21/12, H02K21/24, H02K35/02, H02K41/03, H02K7/18, F03D9/25, // H02K7/08, H02K16/00 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H02K21/12 (EP,US);
F03B13/1845 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
H02K21/24 (EP,US);
H02K35/02 (EP,US);
H02K41/031 (EP,US);
H02K7/088 (EP,US);
H02K7/1838 (EP,US);
F05B2220/7066 (EP,US);
F05B2220/7068 (EP,US);
F05B2220/707 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
H02K2201/15 (EP,US);
H02K7/08 (EP,US);
Y02E10/30 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | H02K23/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENERATOR UND MAGNETFLUSS-LEITUNGSEINHEIT | [2008/52] | English: | GENERATOR AND MAGNETIC FLUX CONDUCTING UNIT | [2008/52] | French: | GENERATEUR ET UNITE CONDUCTRICE DE FLUX MAGNETIQUE | [2018/27] |
Former [2008/52] | GENERATEUR ET UNITE CONDUCTICE DE FLUX MAGNETIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2007 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 05.11.2018 | IE | 14.03.2019 | LU | 14.03.2019 | MT | 14.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3101918 (KUNEL HEINRICH) [X] 1-38 * abstract * * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2004080238 (CUNNINGHAM SYDNEY A [US]) [A] 1-38* abstract *; | [A]US2006038456 (BOJIUC DUMITRU [US]) [A] 1-38 * abstract * | Examination | US5514923 | WO2005089327 | CN1734881 |