EP2010305 - PARTICLE SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acis R&D Limited Shortacre, Brentor, Tavistock Devon PL19 0NG / GB | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOLD, Adrian, Christopher Shortacre Brentor Tavistock Devon PL19 0NG / GB | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Worthington, Richard Easton Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Worthington, Richard Easton Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732072.9 | 21.03.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007GB00980 | Priority number, date | GB20060005866 | 23.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0605866 | GB20060014681 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: GB 0614681 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007107740 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010305 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/16, A47L9/00, B04C3/06, B04C5/04, B04C5/06, B04C5/13 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
A47L9/1608 (EP,GB,US);
A47L9/165 (EP,GB,US);
A47L9/1658 (EP,US);
A47L9/1683 (EP,US);
B04C3/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US);
B04C5/081 (EP,GB,US);
B04C5/185 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | TEILCHENABSCHEIDER | [2009/02] | English: | PARTICLE SEPARATOR | [2009/02] | French: | SÉPARATEUR DE PARTICULES | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 09.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 28.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE729104 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [X]US2580317 (PEKAR JOSEPH C, et al); | [X]GB716383 (WM CORY & SON LTD); | [X]US3957471 (TAMACHI YOSHIHIRO, et al); | [X]EP0284675 (FOSTER WHEELER POWER PROD [GB]); | [X]EP0424079 (ELKEM TECHNOLOGY [NO]); | [X]WO0117688 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) | Examination | US2726767 | US2004103786 |