EP2005717 - USER INTERFACE FOR A COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skype 70 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Dublin 2 / IE | [2012/13] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Skype Limited Earlsfort Centre Arthur Cox Building, Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMB, Duncan Pikk 58/6 10123 Tallinn / EE | 02 /
LAASIK, Marek Sopruse pst. 159B-26 Tallinn 13417 / EE | 03 /
BRENES, Manrique 423 Orchid Avenue Corona del Mar, CA 92625 / US | 04 /
O'LOUGHLIN, Gareth 16B Crossley Street London N7 8PD / GB | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732345.9 | 05.04.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007GB01301 | Priority number, date | GB20060007191 | 10.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607191 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007116214 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005717 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/253, H04M11/08 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
H04M11/08 (EP,BR,US);
H04M1/72427 (EP,BR,US);
H04M7/0033 (GB);
H04M7/0063 (GB);
H04N21/235 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,BR,GB,US);
H04N21/4222 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,BR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EINE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/52] | English: | USER INTERFACE FOR A COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2008/52] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 15.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/19] | 21.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP09075078.7 / EP2063612 | EP09075326.0 / EP2114062 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2012/32] |
Former [2010/17] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 13.01.2010 | ||
[2012/32] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002149705 (ALLEN PAUL G [US], et al); | [DA]WO2005009019 (SKYPER LTD [GB], et al); | [X]US6952414 (WILLIG RANDY C [US]); | [X]US2006040638 (MCQUAIDE ARNOLD JR [US]); | Examination | US2002065111 | by applicant | US6952414 | US2006040638 |