EP2021893 - AUTOMATIC BATHTUB FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vassilev, Plamen Spassov 12 Orion Business Centre Surrey Canal Road London SE14 5RT / GB | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Hammler, Martin Franz Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Hammler, Martin Franz Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732352.5 | 10.04.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007GB01308 | Priority number, date | GB20060009788 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: GB 0609788 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007132143 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2021893 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021893 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/13, E03C1/04 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G05D23/1393 (EP,US);
E03C1/242 (GB);
E03C1/232 (EP,US);
G05D23/1353 (GB);
G05D27/02 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE BADEWANNENFÜLLVORRICHTUNG | [2009/07] | English: | AUTOMATIC BATHTUB FILLER | [2009/07] | French: | REMPLISSEUSE DE BAIGNOIRE AUTOMATIQUE | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/07] | REMPLISSAGE DE BAIGNOIRE AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 15.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | LT | 14.10.2009 | LV | 14.10.2009 | MT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | PL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | IS | 14.02.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | IE | 10.04.2010 | LU | 10.04.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
NL | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2010 | ||
LU | 10.04.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2010 | ||
LU | 10.04.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2010 | ||
IT | 10.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [YX]US3391411 (MILLER JR ANTHONY S); | [DY]GB2174219 (GILFILLAN JAMES IAIN MCGREGOR); | [Y]WO9502737 (KOHLER CO [US], et al); | [A]US6823539 (BANTZ SHANNON R [US]) | by applicant | GB2174219 | US5121509 | DE10031665 | JP2002206802 | US6823539 | GB2424367 |