EP2008074 - LEAK DETECTOR USING AN OPTICAL FIBRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dunlop Oil & Marine Limited Moody Lane Pyewipe, Grimsby DN31 2SP / GB | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANDIYEH, Ali Reza Kambiez Dunlop Oil & Marine Limited Moody Lane Pyewipe Grimsby DN31 2SP / GB | 02 /
STATON, Paul Dunlop Oil & Marine Limited Moody Lane Pyewipe Grimsby DN31 2SP / GB | [2013/08] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
ZANDIYEH, Ali Reza Kambiez Dunlop Oil & Marine Limited Moody Lane Pyewipe Grimsby DN31 2SP / GB | ||
02 /
STATON, Paul Dunlop Oil & Marine Limited Moody Lane Pyewipe Grimsby DN31 2SP / GB | Representative(s) | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/01] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732432.5 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007GB01390 | Priority number, date | GB20060007572 | 18.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607572 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007119056 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008074 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008074 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/38 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G01M3/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LECKDETEKTOR MIT EINER OPTISCHEN FASER | [2009/01] | English: | LEAK DETECTOR USING AN OPTICAL FIBRE | [2009/01] | French: | DETECTEUR DE FUITE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | IE | 18.04.2013 | LU | 18.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 18.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 18.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO02088656 (SENSOR HIGHWAY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,28,30,31,34-37 * abstract * [Y] 6-9,12,13; | [X]JPS5895243 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-5,30,31,34-37 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006038788 (OPTIC FIBER LEAKAGE DETECTION [MX], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,15,28,30,32-37 * abstract *; | [X]WO03060454 (FIBRE OPTICS CT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,12,15,30,32-37 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9418536 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB], et al) [Y] 6-9,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0025344 (MAXWELL AG [CH]) [A] 1,30,34-37 * abstract * | Examination | US5200615 | by applicant | WO02088656 | WO2006038788 | EP0025344 |