EP2016592 - DATA STORAGE DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingenia Holdings (UK) Limited Farringdon Place 20 Farringdon Road London EC1M 3AP / GB | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Ingenia Holdings (UK)Limited Farringdon Place 20 Farringdon Road London EC1M 3AP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWBURN, Russell, Paul Imperial College London Blackett Physics Laboratory Prince Consort Road London SW7 2BW / GB | 02 /
PETIT, Dorothee Imperial College London Blackett Physics Laboratory Prince Consort Road London SW7 2BW / GB | 03 /
READ, Dan Imperial College London Blackett Physics Laboratory Prince Consort Road London SW7 2BW / GB | 04 /
PETRACIC, Oleg Imperial College London Blackett Physics Laboratory Prince Consort Road London SW7 2BW / GB | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Haines, Miles John L.S. D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Haines, Miles John L.S. D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732679.1 | 04.05.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007GB01650 | Priority number, date | GB20060009152 | 09.05.2006 Original published format: GB 0609152 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132174 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2016592 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016592 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11C19/08 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G11C19/0841 (EP,KR);
G11C11/14 (EP,GB,KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR);
G11C11/15 (KR);
G11C19/0808 (EP,GB,KR);
G11C19/0816 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DATENSPEICHERUNG | [2009/04] | English: | DATA STORAGE DEVICE AND METHOD | [2009/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 16.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BE | 16.09.2009 | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | LT | 16.09.2009 | LV | 16.09.2009 | MT | 16.09.2009 | NL | 16.09.2009 | PL | 16.09.2009 | RO | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | IS | 16.01.2010 | PT | 18.01.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | IE | 04.05.2010 | LU | 04.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 04.05.2010 | ||
LU | 04.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 04.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
IE | 04.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
IE | 04.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004077451 (INGENIA TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al); | [AD]US2004252539 (PARKIN STUART S P [US]); | [A]EP1630819 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al); |