Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009209520 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30463607 | 15.06.2007 | WO2007GB02232 | 15.06.2007 | US80484906 | 15.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009541217 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007GB02232 | 15.06.2007 | US80484906 | 15.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2041087 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007GB02232 | 15.06.2007 | US80484906 | 15.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007144639 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80484906 | 15.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101484421 | 15.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80484906 | 15.06.2006 |