EP2176464 - COMPONENTS FOR RAIL FASTENING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/16] | COMPONENTS FOR RAIL FASTENING ASSEMBL | ||
[2014/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANDROL LIMITED 63 Station Road Addlestone, Surrey KT15 2AR / GB | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, Stephen, John 5 Selwyn Avenue Richmond Surrey TW9 2HB / GB | 02 /
HAMILTON, Robert, John Westwood Woollards Road Ash Surrey GU12 5DR / GB | [2014/20] |
Former [2014/03] | 01 /
COX, Stephen, John 5 Selwyn Avenue Richmond Surrey TW9 2HB / GB | ||
02 /
HAMILTON, Robert, John 17 Alterton Close Goldsworth Park Woking Surrey GU21 3DD / GB | |||
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
COX, Stephen, John 5 Selwyn Avenue Richmond Surrey TW9 2HB / GB | ||
02 /
HAMILTON, Robert, John 17 Alterton Close Goldsworth Park Woking Surrey GU21 3DD / GB | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/37] |
Former [2010/16] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733453.0 | 04.07.2007 | [2010/16] | WO2007GB02488 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004274 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176464 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176464 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/30 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
E01B9/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/15] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN FÜR EINE SCHIENENBEFESTIGUNGSANORDNUNG | [2010/16] | English: | COMPONENTS FOR RAIL FASTENING ASSEMBLY | [2014/27] | French: | COMPOSANTS POUR UN ENSEMBLE DE FIXATION DE RAIL | [2010/16] |
Former [2010/16] | COMPONENTS FOR RAIL FASTENING ASSEMBL | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 23.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | [2017/21] |
Former [2016/13] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5865370 (SONNEVILLE ROGER P [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9312296 (PANDROL LTD [GB]) [DA] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0138642 (PANDROL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 29-40 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2152120 (MCKAY RALPH LTD) [A] 29-49 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9312294 | WO9312295 | WO9312296 | US5865370 |