EP1989008 - PRODUCTION OF SECONDARY AGGREGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Greenwich Old Royal Naval College Park Row Greenwich London SE10 9LS / GB | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILLS, Colin, Douglas c/o Centre for Contaminated Land Remediation Chatham Maritime Kent ME4 4TB / GB | 02 /
CAREY, Paula, Jillian c/o Centre for Contaminated Land Remediation Chatham Maritime Kent ME4 4TB / GB | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [2019/26] |
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07733537.0 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007GB50077 | Priority number, date | GB20060003443 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: GB 0603443 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096671 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989008 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1989008 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, B09C1/08, C04B18/02, B01J2/12 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
B09C1/08 (EP,US);
B09B3/25 (EP,US);
C04B18/021 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/021, C04B7/02, C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B18/08, C04B18/103, C04B18/162, C04B40/0231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/26] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SEKUNDÄREN AGGREGATEN | [2014/10] | English: | PRODUCTION OF SECONDARY AGGREGATES | [2008/46] | French: | FABRICATION D'AGREGATS SECONDAIRES | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/46] | HERSTELLUNG VON SEKUNDÄRAGGREGATEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 21.02.2020 | LU | 21.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | LT | 26.06.2019 | |
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 26.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2652107 (PRAYON PRAYON SOC D) [A] 1,5,7-10 * page 6, line 1 - line 8 * * page 16, line 6 - page 18, line 8 * * page 22, line 21 - page 24, line 12 * * page 28, line 9 - page 29, line 24 * * page 32, line 12 - line 27 * * page 34, line 9 - line 16 * * page 36, line 6 - line 11 ** figure - *; | [A]US4950409 (STANFORTH ROBERT R [US]) [A] 1-6,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 13 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 40 - line 52 * * column 4, line 18 - line 68 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 4 *; | [X]US5200033 (WEITZMAN LEO [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 28 * * column 2, line 7 - line 36 * * column 3, line 4 - line 63 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 46 * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 53 * * figure - *; | [DY]US5997629 (HILLS COLIN [GB]) [DY] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 33 * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 1 - line 35 * * column 15, line 22 - column 16, line 37 * * figure 16 *; | [Y]DE10307780 (SCHWETLICK WOLFGANG [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0035] * | Examination | US4402891 | US4636342 | JPS63140042 |