EP2022220 - APPARATUS, METHOD AND MEMORY PROVIDING PARTITIONED DOWNLINK SHARED CONTROL CHANNEL HAVING FIXED AND VARIABLE COMPONENT PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/07] | APPARATUS, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT PROVIDING PARTITIONED DOWNLINK SHARED CONTROL CHANNEL HAVING FIXED AND VARIABLE COMPONENT PARTS | ||
[2019/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHTAVA, Jussi Monreve Kichijoji 103 Shimo-renjaku 8-7-5 Mitaka-shi, Tokyo-to 181-0013 / JP | 02 /
RINNE, Mika, P. Merenneidontie 26 J 02320 Espoo / FI | 03 /
TIRKKONEN, Olav Myrttitie 17 C 00720 Helsinki / FI | [2020/09] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
KAHTAVA, Jussi Monreve Kichijoji 103 Shimo-renjaku 8-7-5 Mitaka-shi, Tokyo-to 181-0013 / JP | ||
02 /
RINNE, Mika, P. Merenneidontie 26 J 02320 Espoo / FI | |||
03 /
TIRKKONEN, Olav Myrttitie 17 C 00720 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2020/09] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/22] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Oy Kolster Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/07] | Keinänen, Anu Kolster Oy Ab P.O.Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07734542.9 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007IB01233 | Priority number, date | US20060799920P | 12.05.2006 Original published format: US 799920 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007132329 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2022220 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022220 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H04W72/1273 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/003 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0073 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0075 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,BR,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | H04W48/12 | ||
Former IPC [2009/07] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SPEICHER, DIE EINEN UNTERTEILTEN GEMEINSAMEN ABWÄRTSSTEUERKANAL MIT FESTGELEGTEN UND VARIABLEN BESTANDTEILEN BEREITSTELLEN | [2019/41] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD AND MEMORY PROVIDING PARTITIONED DOWNLINK SHARED CONTROL CHANNEL HAVING FIXED AND VARIABLE COMPONENT PARTS | [2019/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET MÉMOIRE POUR FORMER UN CANAL DE SIGNALISATION PARTAGÉ DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE PARTITIONNÉE COMPORTANT DES COMPOSANTES FIXES ET VARIABLES | [2019/41] |
Former [2009/07] | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND RECHNERPROGRAMMPRODUKT, DIE EINEN UNTERTEILTEN GEMEINSAMEN ABWÄRTSSTEUERKANAL MIT FESTGELEGTEN UND VARIABLEN BESTANDTEILEN BEREITSTELLEN | ||
Former [2009/07] | APPARATUS, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT PROVIDING PARTITIONED DOWNLINK SHARED CONTROL CHANNEL HAVING FIXED AND VARIABLE COMPONENT PARTS | ||
Former [2009/07] | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR FORMER UN CANAL DE SIGNALISATION PARTAGÉ DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE PARTITIONNÉE COMPORTANT DES COMPOSANTES FIXES ET VARIABLES | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 12.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2007 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | IE | 11.05.2020 | LU | 11.05.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | GB | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
IE | 11.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GB | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
IE | 11.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GB | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
IE | 11.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Shared Control Channel Structure for E-UTRA Downlink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-061433, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060502), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shanghai, China; 20060502, XP050102292 [X] 1-26 * the whole document * | International search | [X]EP1427245 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X] - MOTOROLA, "E-UTRA Downlink Control Channel Structure and TP", 3GPP TSG RAN1#44, R1-060378, DENVER, USA, (20060213), XP002458193 | [A] - ERICSSON, "E-UTRA Downlink Control Signaling - Open Issues", TSG-RAN WG1 #45, R1-061365, SHANGHAI, CHINA, (20060508), XP002493411 | by applicant | - "Shared control channel structure for E-UTRA downlink", 3GPP draft; Rl-061433, 3rd generation partnership project (3GPP, MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTER, (20060502), vol. RAN WG1 |