EP2028991 - HOUSEHOLD WASHING MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A DISHWASHER, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF SAID WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indesit Company S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIGON, Filomena Via Colgiansesco 76 10091 Alpignano (TO) / IT | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Dini, Roberto Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [2009/10] | Application number, filing date | 07734658.3 | 24.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007IB01352 | Priority number, date | IT2006TO00376 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: IT TO20060376 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007138420 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2028991 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
A47L15/0002 (EP);
A47L2601/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSWASCHMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE GESCHIRRSPÜLER, UND VERFAHREN ZU STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS DER WASCHMASCHINE | [2009/10] | English: | HOUSEHOLD WASHING MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A DISHWASHER, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF SAID WASHING MACHINE | [2009/10] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER DOMESTIQUE, EN PARTICULIER LAVE-VAISSELLE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU FONCTIONNEMENT DUDIT LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 25.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1362547 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 40 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0025] , [0027] , [0028] , [0038] , [0041] , [0042] , [0051] *; | [A]DE19957243 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 2-14,16-23 * the whole document * |