EP2030468 - CHANGING LTE SPECIFIC ANCHOR WITH SIMPLE TUNNEL SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOKINEN, Joanna Ramsaynkuja 8 C 9 02760 Espoo / FI | [2023/20] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
JOKINEN, Joanna Puistotie 3 B 2 02760 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
UUSIKARTANO, Joanna Puistotie 3 B 2 02760 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
UUSIKARTANO, Joanna c/o Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
UUSIKARTANO, Joanna c/o Nokia Corporation keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
UUSIKARTANO, Joanna Puistotie 3 B 2 FI-02760 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07734847.2 | 15.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007IB01619 | Priority number, date | US20060814042P | 16.06.2006 Original published format: US 814042 P | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007144762 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030468 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030468 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W36/00, H04W80/04, H04W92/02, H04W92/24 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
H04W36/0033 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US);
H04W92/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | H04W4/00, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2009/10] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/20] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ÄNDERN DES LTE-SPEZIFISCHEN ANKERS MIT EINFACHEM TUNNELWECHSEL | [2009/10] | English: | CHANGING LTE SPECIFIC ANCHOR WITH SIMPLE TUNNEL SWITCHING | [2009/10] | French: | MODIFICATION D'UNE ANCRE LTE SPÉCIFIQUE PAR UNE COMMUTATION SIMPLE DE TUNNEL | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 27.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | IT | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | MC | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | IE | 15.06.2023 | LU | 15.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | GB | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
IT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Relocation of MME/UPE for LTE_ACTIVE UEs", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-060623, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060503), vol. RAN WG3, no. Shanghai, China; 20060503, XP050159559 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, "S1-flex, SAE Pool Area and MME/UPE Relocation", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-060585_S1-FLEX, POOL AREA AND MME_UPE RELOCATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060503), vol. RAN WG3, no. Shanghai, China; 20060503, XP050159522 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - NORTEL NETWORKS, "Matching Inter-working requirements for non Real-time flows", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-060484_INTERWNONRT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060331), vol. RAN WG3, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20060331, XP050159409 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - NORTEL, "Bi-casting for seamless relocation of RT flows", 3GPP DRAFT; S2H060388_BI-CASTING FOR SEAMLESS RELOC OF RT FLOWS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060328), vol. SA WG2, no. Paris; 20060328, XP050229187 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - NORTEL NETWORKS, "Inter-RAT Mobility for Real-time flows", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-060741_RTFL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060503), vol. RAN WG3, no. Shanghai, China; 20060503, XP050159649 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - 3GPP SA WG2, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; 3GPP System Architecture Evolution: Report on Technical Options and Conclusions (Release 7) Version 1.2.3", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICAL REPORT (TR), XX, XX, (20060601), vol. 23.882, no. v1.2.3, page 127, XP002418664 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [07.7] - paragraph [07.8] * * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1592275 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; 3GPP System Architecture Evolution: Report on Technical Options and Conclusions (Release 7)", 3GPP TR 23.882 V1.2.3, (200606), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/23882.htm, XP002418664 | [A] - "MME, UPE and Inter-AS Anchor in the evolved architecture", S2-060133 3GPP TSG SA WG2 ARCHITECTURE S2#50, BUDAPEST, HUNGARY, (20060116), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_50-Budapest/Docs, XP003019603 | [A] - "AGW relocation in LTE-ACTIVE", R3-060424 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 MEETING #51BIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS, FRANCE, (20060403), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3-51bis/docs, XP002453515 | [A] - "Relocation of AGW for LTE_ACTIVE UEs", R3-060439 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 #51-BIS MEETING SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, FRANCE, (20060403), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_51bis/docs, XP002453513 | [AP] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; 3GPP System Architecture Evolution: Report on Technical Options and Conclusions (Release 7)", FD 3.5, (200703), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/23882.htm, XP002451761 |