EP1984958 - PIEZOELECTRIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIEFER, Joachim, R. Scheidener Str. 2b D-66679 Losheim am See / DE | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07734868.8 | 14.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007IB01671 | Priority number, date | GB20060002956 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: GB 0602956 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007093919 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984958 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984958 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/053, H01L41/083 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
H10N30/883 (EP,US);
H10N30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2008/44] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC DEVICE | [2008/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.2009 | BE | 29.04.2009 | CY | 29.04.2009 | CZ | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | EE | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | LT | 29.04.2009 | LV | 29.04.2009 | NL | 29.04.2009 | PL | 29.04.2009 | RO | 29.04.2009 | SI | 29.04.2009 | SK | 29.04.2009 | BG | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | ES | 09.08.2009 | IS | 29.08.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | [2012/37] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
LT | 29.04.2009 | ||
LV | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
IS | 29.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
LT | 29.04.2009 | ||
LV | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
IS | 29.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
LT | 29.04.2009 | ||
LV | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
IS | 29.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2207974 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]US5936004 (ALTMEIER PATRICK [DE]); | [A]EP1126530 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US6379551 (LEE JOSEPH Y [US], et al); | [A]DE10053928 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE10211107 (CERAMTEC AG [DE]); | [A]US6552472 (HEINZ RUDOLF [DE]); | [A]GB2403166 (ACCENTUS PLC [GB]); | [A]WO2005001406 (EAMEX CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2005255370 (FIGUEROA JUAN C [US], et al) |