EP2036270 - DYNAMICALLY CONFIGURING APPLICATION ACCESS POINT SETTINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/12] | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR DYNAMICALLY CONFIGURING APPLICATION ACCESS POINT SETTINGS | ||
[2019/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TENHUNEN, Jouko, U. Raisiontie 8 D 35 FIN-00280 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
BERG, Jyrki, Pe Louhenkatu 2B8 FIN-08100 Lohja / FI | 03 /
LAHTIRANTA, Atte 26 Sweetwater Avenue 01730 Bedford, Massachusetts / US | 04 /
SAINIO, Miikka Jaakkolantie 11 C 23 FIN-04250 Kerava / FI | 05 /
MANNERMAA, Mika 16 Seven Springs Lane Apt. 1 Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
TENHUNEN, Jouko, U. Raisiontie 8 D 35 FIN-00280 Helsinki / FI | ||
02 /
BERG, Jyrki, Pe Louhenkatu 2B8 FIN-08100 Lohja / FI | |||
03 /
LAHTIRANTA, Atte Kaksoiskiventie 36 B FIN-02760 Espoo / FI | |||
04 /
SAINIO, Miikka Jaakkolantie 11 C 23 FIN-04250 Kerava / FI | |||
05 /
MANNERMAA, Mika Otakallio 4 E 57 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2019/30] |
Former [2012/22] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Kurig, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus, Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07734952.0 | 25.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007IB01881 | Priority number, date | US20060478351 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: US 478351 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008001214 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2036270 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036270 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, H04M15/00, // H04W88/06 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,CN,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | H04W8/24 | ||
Former IPC [2009/12] | H04L12/56, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES KONFIGURIEREN VON ANWENDUNGSZUGANGSPUNKTEINSTELLUNGEN | [2019/13] | English: | DYNAMICALLY CONFIGURING APPLICATION ACCESS POINT SETTINGS | [2019/13] | French: | CONFIGURATION DYNAMIQUE DES PARAMÈTRES DE POINTS D'ACCÈS D'APPLICATION | [2019/13] |
Former [2009/12] | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DYNAMISCHEN KONFIGURIEREN VON ANWENDUNGSZUGANGSPUNKTEINSTELLUNGEN | ||
Former [2009/12] | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR DYNAMICALLY CONFIGURING APPLICATION ACCESS POINT SETTINGS | ||
Former [2009/12] | SYSTÈMES, APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR CONFIGURER DYNAMIQUEMENT DES PARAMÈTRES DE POINTS D'ACCÈS D'APPLICATION | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 21.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2007 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004240450 (TURCANU CALIN [FI], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [0042] - [0055]; figure 2 *; | [XPI]WO2006100459 (ORANGE SA [FR], et al) [XP] 1,2,13-15,17-21 * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 5 *[I] 3-10,16; | [XI] - LIEBSCH M ET AL, "Candidate Access Router Discovery (CARD); RFC 4066", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE (IETF), (200507), XP015041933 [X] 1,13,18,20,21 * pages 4-7; figure 1 * [I] 2-12,14-17,19 | International search | [A]EP1531645 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2005062652 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X] - ZAFEIRIS V. ET AL., "An agent-based architecture for handover initiation and decision in 4G networks", WORLD OF WIRELESS MOBILE AND MULTIMEDIA NETWORKS, 2005. WOWMOM 2005. SIXTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, (20050613), URL: http://www.ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel5/9858/31043/01443487.pdf?isnumber=31043iC=STD&arnumber=1443487&arnumber=1443487&arSt=+72&ared=+77&arAuthor=Zafeiris%2C+V.E.%3B+Giakoumakis%2C+E.A, XP010811068 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WOWMOM.2005.22 | [A] - ALPER E YEGIN ET AL., "Supporting Optimized Handover for IP Mobility Requirements for Underlying Systems", INTERNET DRAFT, (200206), URL: http://www.tools.ietf.org.id/draft-manyfolks-12-mobilereq-02.txt, XP015004314 | by applicant | US2004240450 |