EP2007628 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING CONFECTIONARY PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.C. AUTOMATIONS S.r.l. Via Guido Rossa 30 40033 Casalecchio di Reno (BO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states M.C. AUTOMATIONS S.r.l. Via Guido Rossa 30 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASELLI, Mario Via Guido Rossa, 30 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | [2009/18] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
CASELLI, Mario Via Guido Rossa 30 I-40033 Casalecchio Di Reno (bo) / IT | Representative(s) | di Francia, Vincenzo Manzella & Associati Via Nosadella 9 40123 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | di Francia, Vincenzo Manzella & Associati Via Nosadella 9 40123 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 07735316.7 | 29.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007IB51122 | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00251 | 06.04.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060251 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007113752 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2007628 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2007628 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/12, B65B11/34, B65B1/30 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B65B11/32 (EP);
B65B25/005 (EP);
B65B51/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINWICKELN VON SÜSSWARENPRODUKTEN | [2009/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING CONFECTIONARY PRODUCTS | [2009/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'EMBALLAGE DE CONFISERIES | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | MT | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | IE | 29.03.2010 | LU | 29.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
IT | 29.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0733548 (NUOVA FIMA IMBALLAGGI [IT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0802114 (SOREMARTEC SA [BE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0816229 (PACTEC VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN FA [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5935686 (DAELMANS EDDY [BE], et al) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0929457 (NAESLUND INGEMAR [SE]) |