EP2049461 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BIODIESEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.& A. F.lli Parodi S.r.l. Via Valverde 53 16014 Campomorone (GE) / IT | [2011/45] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states A.& A. F.lli Parodi S.r.l. Via Valverde 53 16014 Campomorone (GE) / IT | ||
For all designated states DP Lubrificanti srl Via dell'Agricoltura 8 09030 Elmas (CA) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARODI, Augusto Via Pozzi 11 I-16167 Genova / IT | 02 /
MARINI, Leandro Via Villa Lidia 57/2 I-16014 Ceranesi / IT | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
PARODI, Augusto Via Pozzi 11 Via Pozzi 11 I-16167 Genova / IT | ||
02 /
MARINI, Leandro Via Villa Lidia 57/2 Via Villa Lidia 57/2 I-16014 Ceranesi / IT | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07735841.4 | 10.05.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007IB51763 | Priority number, date | EP20060116898 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06116898 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008007231 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049461 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049461 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/08, C07C67/03, C07C69/24, C07C69/52, C11C3/10, C11C3/06, C10L1/02 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C10L1/026 (EP);
C07C67/03 (EP);
C07C67/08 (EP);
C11C3/003 (EP);
C11C3/025 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/24 (EP);
C07C67/03, C07C69/52 (EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/24 (EP);
C07C67/08, C07C69/52 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIODIESEL | [2009/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BIODIESEL | [2009/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BIODIESEL | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2010 | 13.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | MT | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | IE | 10.05.2012 | LU | 10.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | BE | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5424466 (STERN ROBERT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 25 * * column 4, line 3 - line 9 * * column 5, line 6 - line 17 * * example -; claim 9 *; | [Y]DE19620523 (L U T LABOR UND UMWELTTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 48; figure 1 * * example 1 * * example 3 *; | [A]EP1061120 (LONFORD DEV LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0001]; claim - *; | [Y]US2002013486 (ERGUN NURHAN [AT], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] , [0072]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2005019153 (STEPAN CO [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0008] - [0010] - [0014] , [0017] , [0017] * * example - *; | [Y] - JAN CVENGROS, ANNA PAVLOVICOVA, GABRIELA GLADISOVA, JIRI CERNY, "Rapeseed oil methyl esters with low phosphorus content", FETT - LIPID., DEWILEY-VCH VERLAG,WEINHEIM., (199907), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 261 - 265, XP002459290 [Y] 1-9 * page 261, column R, paragraph 3 - page 262, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 262, column L, paragraph 7 * * page 262, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 264 3.2 Methyl ester distillation, table 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4133(199907)101:7<261::AID-LIPI261>3.0.CO;2-5 | Examination | - BIODIESEL ASSOCIATION OF CANADA - ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DE BIODIESEL, BIODIESEL BASICS, (2005), pages 1 - 4 |