EP2022279 - CATHETER INSERTION APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexicath Ltd. P.O.Box 9966 34341 Haifa / IL | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMISAR, Shai Nahalat Izhak 18b-241 67448 Tel-Aviv / IL | 02 /
RADOMSKI, Ronen 10 David Elazar St. (Meridien) Apartment 605 35081 Haifa / IL | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street GB-London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07736292.9 | 06.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007IL00552 | Priority number, date | US20060800413P | 16.05.2006 Original published format: US 800413 P | US20070902049P | 20.02.2007 Original published format: US 902049 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007132444 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2022279 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M25/01 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0111 (EP,US);
A61M25/0612 (EP,US);
A61M25/0668 (EP,US);
A61M25/0097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | A61M25/06 | ||
Former IPC [2009/09] | H04W84/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/07] | H04Q7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHETEREINFÜGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/07] | English: | CATHETER INSERTION APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2009/07] | French: | APPAREIL D'INSERTION DE CATHÉTER ET MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 25.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3185151 (CZORNY VASIL P) [X] 1,2,14 * the whole document * [Y] 3-12,15; | [XY]US2937643 (ELLIOT ERIC C) [X] 1,2,14 * the whole document * [Y] 3-12,15; | [X]US4997421 (PALSROK GARY [US], et al) [X] 13 * figure 1 * * columns 2,3 *; | [X]US5125911 (GRABENKORT RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 13 * figures 2,3 * * columns 2,3 *; | [E]WO2007052278 (FLEXICATH LTD [IL], et al) [E] 13 * figures 7a,7b,7c,7d * * pages 29,30 * | International search | [Y]US3547119 (HALL JOHN P, et al); | [X]US4997421 (PALSROK GARY [US], et al); | [A]US4689047 (BAUER GARY W [US]) |