EP2003772 - MOTOR DRIVE CIRCUIT, METHOD, AND DISC DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTAGURO, Yoshito, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07736902.3 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007JP00245 | Priority number, date | JP20060092322 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006092322 | JP20060092326 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006092326 | JP20060103466 | 04.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006103466 | [2008/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122784 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003772 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2003772 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/18, G11B19/28 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
G11B19/28 (EP,KR,US);
H02P6/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/18] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORANTRIEBSSCHALTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PLATTENANORDNUNG DAMIT | [2008/51] | English: | MOTOR DRIVE CIRCUIT, METHOD, AND DISC DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2008/51] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR, PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF DE DISQUE UTILISANT UN TEL CIRCUIT | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2008 | Translation filed | 06.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 30.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004042912 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPH09266690 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JPH03207250 | JP2001190085 |