Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
30.03.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.03.2009 | Change - designated states | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
24.03.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
13.03.2009 | Correction of patent application | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
19.12.2008 | Change or deletion - publication of A document | published on 17.12.2008 [2009/04] |
02.12.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.11.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
14.11.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
12.11.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.01.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.11.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication |