EP2000154 - COMPOSITION FOR PREPARATION OF RADIOACTIVE PHARMACEUTICAL FOR DIAGNOSIS OF REGIONAL CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 17-10, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040031 / JP | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAJIMA, Akihito c/o Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 453-1, Shimo-Okura, Matsuo-machi Sammu-shi, Chiba 289-1592 / JP | 02 /
SAWANO, Kaita c/o Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 453-1, Shimo-Okura, Matsuo-machi Sammu-shi, Chiba 289-1592 / JP | 03 /
MATSUSHIMA, Satoshi c/o Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 453-1, Shimo-Okura, Matsuo-machi Sammu-shi, Chiba 289-1592 / JP | [2013/32] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
KITAJIMA, Akihito c/o Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 453-1, Shimo-Okura, Matsuo-machi Sammu-shi, Chiba 289-1592 / JP | ||
02 /
SAWANO, Kaita c/o Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 453-1, Shimo-Okura, Matsuo-machi Sammu-shi, Chiba 289-1592 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUSHIMA, Satoshi c/o Fujifilm RI Pharma Co., Ltd. 453-1, Shimo-Okura, Matsuo-machi Sammu-shi, Chiba 289-1592 / JP | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Blodig, Wolfgang, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07736940.3 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007JP00283 | Priority number, date | JP20060083664 | 24.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006083664 | [2008/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007111020 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000154 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2000154 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, C07F13/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
C07F13/005 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RADIOAKTIVEN PHARMAZEUTIKUMS ZUR DIAGNOSE DES REGIONALEN ZEREBRALEN BLUTFLUSSES | [2008/50] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PREPARATION OF RADIOACTIVE PHARMACEUTICAL FOR DIAGNOSIS OF REGIONAL CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW | [2008/50] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE RADIOACTIF POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DU FLOT SANGUIN REGIONAL | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2008 | Translation filed | 16.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 30.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 08.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1141197 (NAISIDA NEW TECH DEV CO BEIJIN [CN]) [X] 1-4,6-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS63295549 (DU PONT); | [Y]JPH07173132 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0797361 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002205959 (PHOTOCHEMICAL CO); | [X] - "Saikin no Shinyaku (Dai 46 Shu) - 1995 Nenpan-", KABUSHIKI KAISHA YAKUJI NIPPOSHA, (19950403), page 302, XP003018155 | by applicant | JPH0764802B |