EP2022346 - BEVERAGE PACKED IN CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATAKE, Norihiko Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
IWASAKI, Masaki Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Hiroko Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 04 /
HOSOYA, Naoki Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 05 /
MORIYA, Naoko Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
SATAKE, Norihiko Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
IWASAKI, Masaki Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
UCHIDA, Hiroko Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
HOSOYA, Naoki Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | |||
05 /
MORIYA, Naoko Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07737168.0 | 14.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP00512 | Priority number, date | JP20060137007 | 16.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006137007 | JP20070029017 | 08.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007029017 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132562 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022346 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022346 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/52, A23F3/16, A23L2/00, A23L2/42 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/38 (KR);
A23F3/163 (EP,KR,US);
A23F3/18 (KR);
A23F3/20 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,KR,US);
B65D85/72 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/09] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IN BEHÄLTNIS ABGEPACKTES GETRÄNK | [2009/07] | English: | BEVERAGE PACKED IN CONTAINER | [2009/07] | French: | BOISSON CONDITIONNÉE EN RÉCIPIENT | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2008 | Translation filed | 14.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 17.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2004321105 ; | [X]US2003096050 (INAOKA SETSUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-2,4 * paragraphs [0014] , [0040] , [0047]; claim - *; | [E]EP2008525 (KAO CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * example 2; claim -; table 3 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 79, Database accession no. 2004-801231, XP002557472 & JP2004321105 A 20041118 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [I] 1-4 | International search | [X]JP2003169641 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JPS59219384 | JPH01289447 | JPH0420589 | JPH05153910 | JPH05260907 | JPH05306279 | JPH08109178 | JP2002335911 | JP2003033157 | - JIS Z8144 / Sensory Test Handbook, (19900209), pages 448 - 449 |