EP2002832 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING LIGNAN COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | ||
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Suntory Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAI, Masaaki Suntory Limited Research Center Annex 3-3-22, Takahama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0012 / JP | 02 /
AOSHIMA, Yukihiro Suntory Limited Research Center Annex 3-3-22, Takahama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0012 / JP | 03 /
ENDO, Shuji Suntory Limited Research Center Annex 3-3-22, Takahama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0012 / JP | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07738583.9 | 14.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007JP55113 | Priority number, date | JP20060097871 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006097871 | [2008/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114013 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002832 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2002832 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/36, A61K9/08, A61K9/48, A61K47/14, A61P3/06, A61P11/06, A61P25/32, A61P25/34, A61P35/00, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07D493/04 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER LIGNAN-VERBINDUNG | [2008/51] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING LIGNAN COMPOUND | [2008/51] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN COMPOSE LIGNANE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2008 | Translation filed | 09.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1930333 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8 * page 6, line 50 - page 7, line 10 * * page 10; table 1 * * claims 1-20 *; | [E]EP1950214 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8 * page 4, lines 53-57 * * page 6, lines 27-44 * * page 7, lines 11-13 * | International search | [Y]JPS4971127 ; | [Y]JPS5913717 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]WO2004064830 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al); | [X]WO2004105749 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2005095414 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2006016682 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2006106926 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2006280276 (SUNTORY LTD); | [XP]JP2006306864 (SUNTORY LTD) | by applicant | JPS5492616 | US4427694 | JPH02138120 | JPH031589B | JPH0370611B | JPH0375358B | JPH0375360B | JPH04159221 | JPH0543458 | JPH0551388 | JPH06227977 | JP3124062B | JP3183664B | JP3283274B |