EP1993243 - TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Tsuyoshi@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
IGATA, Yuji@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
YOKOMITSU, Yasushi@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
YASUKAWA, Toru@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
OHMI, Shinichiro@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
IKEDA, Koji@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
KATAOKA, Masanori@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
YANO, Junji@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
KURODA, Go@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/23] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Tsuyoshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
IGATA, Yuji Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
YOKOMITSU, Yasushi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
YASUKAWA, Toru Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
OHMI, Shinichiro Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
06 /
IKEDA, Koji Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
07 /
KATAOKA, Masanori Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
08 /
YANO, Junji Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
09 /
KURODA, Go Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC IP Dev.Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07738870.0 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007JP55425 | Priority number, date | JP20060073365 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006073365 | [2008/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007119403 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1993243 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1993243 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, // H04L12/26 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
H04L12/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/15542 (KR);
H04L47/15 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2009/16] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT | [2008/47] | English: | TERMINAL | [2008/47] | French: | TERMINAL | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2008 | Translation filed | 20.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 17.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.09.2012 | [2013/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JIA W ET AL, "Integrated fault-tolerant multicast and anycast routing algorithms", IEE PROCEEDINGS E. COMPUTERS & DIGITAL TECHNIQUES, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, (20000728), vol. 147, no. 4, doi:10.1049/IP-CDT:20000532, ISSN 0143-7062, pages 266 - 274, XP006013916 [A] 1-21 * section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cdt:20000532 | International search | [A]JP2003174478 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]JP2003101504 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2003169036 (JAPAN TELECOM CO LTD) |